07/02/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/18/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 3646.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3589.) (May 24). | |||
05/22/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/21/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/11/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3261.) (April 23). | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 23. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
01/20/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. | |||
01/19/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |