08/13/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
08/09/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/09/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4442.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/07/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4297.) (July 3). | |||
06/19/2012 | Set for hearing July 3. | |||
06/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3922.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing June 13. | |||
05/10/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | |||
05/08/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
01/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. | |||
01/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |