|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Received by the Desk on April 27 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(5).)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3119.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|