05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
04/30/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 6. Page 3205.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/19/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/14/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
03/02/2012 | Set for hearing March 20. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
01/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. | |||
01/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |