04/17/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/10/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
03/22/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
01/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. | |||
01/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |