|
09/01/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6349.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2968.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|