LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB985
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB985
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB985
Action History
04/17/2012
Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
04/05/2012
Set for hearing April 17.
04/04/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/13/2012
Set for hearing April 10.
02/16/2012
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
01/31/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
01/30/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.