05/31/2012 | Amendments by Senator Huff tabled on motion of Senator Corbett. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3747.) Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 7. Noes 18. Page 3747.) | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3589.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/24/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3206.) (April 18). | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/23/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
03/22/2012 | Set for hearing March 28. | |||
03/22/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/06/2012 | Set for hearing March 21. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/01/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. | |||
01/31/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |