05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/23/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3022.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/19/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing March 27. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/02/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | |||
02/01/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |