|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5523.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3615.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|