LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB99
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB99
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB99
Action History
02/24/2011
Referred to Com. on APPR.
02/14/2011
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
02/14/2011
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 171.) Ordered to the Assembly.
02/10/2011
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
01/20/2011
Referred to Com. on RLS.
01/11/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
01/10/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.