|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 792, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3163.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3104.) (April 9).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|