LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB999
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB999
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB999
Action History
05/03/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/26/2012
Set for hearing May 8.
02/16/2012
Referred to Com. on JUD.
02/07/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
02/06/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 8.) (Corrected February 9.)