09/12/2011 | From Assembly without further action. | |||
09/12/2011 | From committee without further action. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
06/09/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
06/06/2011 | Consent granted to take up without reference to committee or file. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 189.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/27/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 109.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/25/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. |