|
04/12/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2011-12 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 134.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (March 14).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (March 3). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 44.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 42.) (February 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
Set for hearing February 23.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 35.) (February 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
Set for hearing February 15.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected March 29.)
|
|
|