09/12/2011 | From Assembly without further action. | |||
09/12/2011 | From committee without further action. | |||
08/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
08/15/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 133.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 133.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/02/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/25/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/24/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. |