California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SBX125 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/15/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SBX1 25INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senators Alquist and Lowenthal JULY 15, 2011 An act to add Section 89517.5 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 25, as introduced, Alquist. California State University: compensation. (1) Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in the state. This bill would prohibit, on or after January 1, 2012, the Trustees of the California State University from entering into, or renewing, a contract that provides for a compensation increase for any administrator of more than 10% using General Fund moneys in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately past contract for that same position, if in that same fiscal year there has been a tuition or fee increase. (2) The California Constitution authorizes the Governor to declare a fiscal emergency and to call the Legislature into special session for that purpose. Governor Schwarzenegger issued a proclamation declaring a fiscal emergency, and calling a special session for this purpose, on December 6, 2010. Governor Brown issued a proclamation on January 20, 2011, declaring and reaffirming that a fiscal emergency exists and stating that his proclamation supersedes the earlier proclamation for purposes of that constitutional provision. This bill would state that it addresses the fiscal emergency declared and reaffirmed by the Governor by proclamation issued on January 20, 2011, pursuant to the California Constitution. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89517.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89517.5. On or after January 1, 2012, the Trustees of the California State University shall not enter into, or renew, a contract that provides for a compensation increase for any administrator of more than 10 percent using General Fund moneys in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately past contract for that same position, if in that same fiscal year there has been a tuition or fee increase. SEC. 2. This act addresses the fiscal emergency declared and reaffirmed by the Governor by proclamation on January 20, 2011, pursuant to subdivision (f) of Section 10 of Article IV of the California Constitution.