09/12/2011 | From Assembly without further action. | |||
09/10/2011 | Died at Desk. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/22/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 200.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/17/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 202.) (August 15). | |||
07/07/2011 | Set for hearing August 15. | |||
07/05/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/01/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 180.) (June 29). | |||
06/21/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
06/16/2011 | Set for hearing June 29. | |||
06/15/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/01/2011 | Set for hearing June 15. | |||
04/12/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |