LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX14
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX14
Compare Versions
SBX14 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SBX14 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SBX14 Amended September 9, 2011
SBX14 Amended September 2, 2011
SBX14 Introduced May 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SBX14 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SBX14 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SBX14 Amended September 9, 2011
SBX14 Amended September 2, 2011
SBX14 Introduced May 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare