09/16/2011 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |||
09/14/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/08/2011 | In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 243.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 317.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
09/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 11.) (September 7). | |||
09/06/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
09/01/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
06/09/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
06/06/2011 | Consent granted to take up without reference to committee or file. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 189.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/27/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 107.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/25/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. |