Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
07/19/2012
Set for hearing August 8.
06/27/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
06/16/2012
Set for hearing June 27.
05/24/2012
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
05/16/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after June 15.
05/15/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.