08/21/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4641.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4641.) | |||
05/27/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/26/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1123.) (May 26). | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/16/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 853.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/31/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/25/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |