06/21/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/10/2011 | Set for hearing June 21. | |||
06/06/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/26/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. (Corrected May 31.) | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing June 7. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 763.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |