LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA6
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA6
Action History
02/16/2011
Hearing postponed by committee.
02/09/2011
Set for hearing February 23.
01/20/2011
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
01/07/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
01/06/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.