|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1123.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 853.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 560.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5. (Vote only.)
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|