LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCAX11
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCAX11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCAX11
Action History
09/10/2011
From committee without further action.
03/21/2011
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/17/2011
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
03/15/2011
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
03/14/2011
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS.