09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5112.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/30/2012 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6671.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/29/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |||
08/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/21/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4631.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/08/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/26/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |