08/31/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/31/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/29/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Page 6579.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/28/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 28). | |||
08/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
08/13/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/13/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 4469.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/08/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/26/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |