09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/31/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 31). Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6761.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/24/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/23/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4780.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/22/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
08/20/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4549.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/10/2012 | Set for hearing August 14. | |||
08/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
08/08/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
07/02/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |