09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/31/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6739.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |||
08/28/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/28/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 4908.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/13/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/06/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |