09/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/10/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/31/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6745.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/30/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). | |||
08/28/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/28/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4908.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/27/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |