06/22/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/22/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
06/20/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/20/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Page 1996.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 13). | |||
05/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/05/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 875.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 763.) (April 27). | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/10/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |