08/25/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/25/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
08/22/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2004.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/18/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2455.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/14/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). | |||
05/18/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 19.) | |||
05/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/25/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 707.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/13/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |