09/14/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/14/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
09/08/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2418.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
09/07/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
09/07/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2986.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
09/01/2011 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2772.) Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/31/2011 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/29/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |||
08/22/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/22/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2005.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
07/13/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/24/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |