08/25/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/25/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/22/2011 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. Action rescinded whereby the measure was read, adopted, and ordered to Senate. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2505.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/07/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 6). | |||
06/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/09/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/09/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1354.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
06/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/28/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |