LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR25
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR25
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR25
Compare Versions
SCR25 Chaptered September 15, 2011
SCR25 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SCR25 Amended June 13, 2011
SCR25 Amended June 8, 2011
SCR25 Introduced March 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SCR25 Chaptered September 15, 2011
SCR25 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SCR25 Amended June 13, 2011
SCR25 Amended June 8, 2011
SCR25 Introduced March 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare