LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR26
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR26
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR26
Compare Versions
SCR26 Chaptered September 15, 2011
SCR26 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SCR26 Amended September 8, 2011
SCR26 Amended April 25, 2011
SCR26 Introduced March 21, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SCR26 Chaptered September 15, 2011
SCR26 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SCR26 Amended September 8, 2011
SCR26 Amended April 25, 2011
SCR26 Introduced March 21, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare