|
09/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2461.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3109.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (September 2).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 865.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|