05/24/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011. | |||
05/24/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |||
05/23/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/18/2011 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/14/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/14/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 651.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/06/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/30/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |