05/23/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011. | |||
05/23/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1455.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/28/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/28/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/04/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |