07/19/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/19/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 2347.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/11/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 6). | |||
07/01/2011 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 737.) (April 25). | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
04/04/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |