|
09/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 3247.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (September 9).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2254.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2043.) (August 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Set for hearing August 23.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|