BILL NUMBER: SCR 34CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 93 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 15, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Evans APRIL 5, 2011 Relative to the Deputy Frank Trejo Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 34, Evans. Deputy Frank Trejo Memorial Interchange. This measure would designate the State Highway Route 101 interchange at State Highway Route 12 in the City of Santa Rosa as the Deputy Frank Trejo Memorial Interchange. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, The men and women serving in law enforcement have the demanding mission to secure the public safety and prevent crime and violence; and WHEREAS, This vital mission is also distinctly dangerous and many dedicated law enforcement officers, including Deputy Frank Trejo of the Sonoma County Sheriff's Office, have lost their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Californians are indebted to the peace officers that serve and protect us every day. We recognize their bravery and devotion, and share in their pain when a law enforcement officer is killed in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Deputy Trejo served the residents of Sonoma County faithfully as a deputy sheriff for 15 years, until March 29, 1995, when he was shot and killed in the line of duty while investigating a suspicious motor vehicle in his beat west of the City of Santa Rosa; and WHEREAS, Deputy Trejo was posthumously awarded the Sonoma County Sheriff's Office highest award, the Gold Medal of Valor, for his sacrifice; and WHEREAS, Deputy Trejo loved being a law enforcement officer, protecting the public, and serving his community. He was a career lawman with a career spanning 35 years, serving as a police officer for the Cities of Lompoc and Tiburon prior to joining the Sonoma County Sheriff's Office; and WHEREAS, Deputy Trejo was affectionately known as the "old man" in the sheriff's office and is credited with mentoring many younger officers over the course of his 35-year career; and WHEREAS, Deputy Trejo is remembered as a loving husband to his wife Barbara, father to his four children, grandfather, and great-grandfather; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Deputy Trejo's contributions and sacrifice in serving and protecting the residents of Sonoma County, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 12, west of the City of Santa Rosa, as the Deputy Frank Trejo Memorial Interchange; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the State Highway Route 101 interchange at State Highway Route 12 in the City of Santa Rosa as the Deputy Frank Trejo Memorial Interchange; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing that special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.