|
07/19/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Page 2332.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1141.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 951.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|