BILL NUMBER: SCR 35CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 61 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 19, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 19, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Simitian APRIL 5, 2011 Relative to the Don Burnett Bicycle-Pedestrian Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 35, Simitian. Don Burnett Bicycle-Pedestrian Bridge. This measure would designate the bicycle and pedestrian bridge that crosses State Highway Route 280 at Mary Avenue between the Cities of Cupertino and Sunnyvale in the County of Santa Clara as the Don Burnett Bicycle-Pedestrian Bridge. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, April 2009 marked the official opening of the bicycle-pedestrian bridge presently known as the Mary Avenue Bridge, over State Highway Route 280 between the Cities of Cupertino and Sunnyvale in California; and WHEREAS, The concept for the bridge was originated in the early 1990s by bicycle advocate Don Burnett. For many years, Don Burnett led, encouraged, and supported efforts to construct and finance the bridge. The construction and finance efforts began in 1993 when Don Burnett began eight years of service as a Cupertino City Councilman and as Mayor of the City of Cupertino from 1995 through 1996; and WHEREAS, Don Burnett's initial work identified the importance of alternatives to the automobile; and WHEREAS, Don Burnett was recognized for his past bicycling and pedestrian activities by the City Council of the City of Cupertino in a proclamation on May 18, 2010, which noted his efforts in forming the City of Cupertino's first Bicycle Advisory Committee, now called the Bicycle Pedestrian Commission. The proclamation recognized him as "an unsurpassed bike advocate who was the key author of the city's bicycle plan and pedestrian plan"; and WHEREAS, Don Burnett served in an active role in leadership and support of recreational bicycle rides for the Western Wheelers Bicycle Club, Almaden Cycle Touring Club, and Skyline Cycling Club, and was the recipient of many awards from those organizations; and WHEREAS, Don Burnett served on the board of the Silicon Valley Bicycle Coalition and received the 2005 Advocate of the Decade Award "for years of bicycle commuting, followed by years of advocacy... and trails watchdog for the Santa Clara Valley Water District"; and WHEREAS, Don Burnett served the Valley Transportation Authority as a volunteer on the Citizens Advisory Committee and Citizens Watchdog Committee from 2004 through 2008. Following his death on September 11, 2010, the Board of Directors of the Valley Transportation Authority adjourned their regular meeting on October 7, 2010, in memory of Don Burnett; and WHEREAS, Don Burnett was a giving person whose life was dedicated to service to others, and he never sought to further his own political growth; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That in recognition of the numerous achievements and contributions of Donald R. Burnett, the Legislature hereby designates the bicycle and pedestrian bridge which crosses State Highway Route 280 at Mary Avenue between the Cities of Cupertino and Sunnyvale in the County of Santa Clara as the Don Burnett Bicycle-Pedestrian Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature requests the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signage showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit a copy of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and the author for appropriate distribution.