California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR36 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/23/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 36CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 22 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 23, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 12, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Blakeslee APRIL 7, 2011 Relative to Viral Hepatitis Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 36, Blakeslee. Viral Hepatitis Awareness Day. This measure would declare May 19, 2011, to be Viral Hepatitis Awareness Day in California. WHEREAS, Liver cancer and liver disease related to hepatitis B and hepatitis C are among the leading killers in California; and WHEREAS, Hepatitis C is the most prevalent bloodborne disease in the United States and in California; and WHEREAS, Early detection of hepatitis B or hepatitis C infection promotes effective management or treatment of these infections, preventing disability, loss of productivity and income, and allows persons to live full, satisfying, and productive lives; and WHEREAS, Undetected and untreated hepatitis B or hepatitis C infection can lead to disability or death; and WHEREAS, The majority of the estimated half million California residents with chronic hepatitis C infection do not know they are infected, and are therefore at high risk of severe liver disease, liver cancer, or liver failure; and WHEREAS, The majority of the estimated 125,000 California residents with hepatitis B infection do not know that they are infected, and are therefore at high risk of severe liver disease, liver cancer, or liver failure; and WHEREAS, Untreated hepatitis B and hepatitis C leading causes of liver failure requiring a liver transplant; and WHEREAS, There is a vaccine for the prevention of hepatitis B, the first proven, low-cost vaccination against any form of cancer made available to Americans; and WHEREAS, The cost of hospitalizations for liver cancer and liver disease reached $2 billion in California in 2007, mostly paid for by tax-supported public health insurers; and WHEREAS, Hepatitis awareness education campaigns and accessible screening for hepatitis B and hepatitis C, along with appropriate treatment, can reduce the damage from hepatitis B and hepatitis C viral infection to individuals and to our community, financially as well as physically and emotionally; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California declares May 19, 2011, to be Viral Hepatitis Awareness Day in California; and be it further, Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.