06/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1756.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 27). | |||
05/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/05/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 874.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/27/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/15/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |