06/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
06/01/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1249.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/24/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1517.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |||
05/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 960.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/11/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/28/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |