06/21/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/21/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
06/16/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1959.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/13/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
05/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/19/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/28/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |