06/30/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/30/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
06/27/2011 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1572.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/16/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1959.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/13/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
06/09/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 957.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/04/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/02/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |